HI HB1572 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1572
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii Economic Security Working Group within DBEDT to analyze and make recommendations regarding economic health and stability in light of future automation, globalization, and disruptive innovation. (HB1572 HD1)
Title
Relating To Labor.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 642), recommending referral to JUD. |
2017-02-15 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Holt, Johanson, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-15-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2). |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 210) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDB. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-30 | House | Re-referred to LAB, EDB, JUD, referral sheet 7 |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to EDB, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1572 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).