HI HB1570 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1570
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 689).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 689).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires lessors of rental motor vehicles to include an option for the lessee in the motor vehicle rental agreement to contribute a sum to DLNR for the preservation and protection of the environment, commencing on January 1, 2020. (HB1570 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Environment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 689). |
2018-04-26 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Aquino, Luke Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2018-04-12 | House | Referred to conference. |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 575). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3563) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 04-06-18 10:55AM in conference room 211. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | The committee on WAM will reconsider its previous decision on 04-05-18 and will hold a public decision making on 04-06-18 10:55AM in conference room 211. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-18 10:15AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to TRE/CPH/AEN, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 208). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 869), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3). |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 455), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-02-10 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Hashem, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2017-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-10-17 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Souki excused (2). |
2017-02-06 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 42) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to TRN. |
2017-02-02 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Kong, Say, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-02-17 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to EEP, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1570 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to TRE/CPH/AEN, WAM.