HI HB1569 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1569
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Public Utilities Commission, when considering certain types of grid modernization plans, to direct an independent third party to establish an initial grid modernization plan. Requires the Commission to allow public comments and subjects the plan to further modification by the Commission. (HB1569 HD1)
Title
Relating To Energy Planning.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-24 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-01-17 1:55PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-23 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-01-17. |
2017-02-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-23-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2). |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 365) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Kong, Say, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2017-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-17. |
2017-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-02-17 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1569 (Carry Over) 2017-03-01 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.