HI HB1566 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with Representative(s) Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kong, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, Okimoto, Takayama, Tarnas, Tokioka, Yamashita voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cachola, B. Kobayashi, McDermott, Ward, Yamane voting no (5) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes and establishes procedures and criteria for prescriptive authority for clinical psychologists who meet specific education, training, and registration requirements. Requires the Board of Psychology to report to the Legislature prior to the Regular Session of 2021. Sunsets on 8/31/2025. (HB1566 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Prescriptive Authority For Certain Clinical Psychologists.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with Representative(s) Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kong, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, Okimoto, Takayama, Tarnas, Tokioka, Yamashita voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cachola, B. Kobayashi, McDermott, Ward, Yamane voting no (5) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
2019-02-07HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 154) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD.
2019-02-05HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tokioka; 2 Noes: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:45AM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback