HI HB1564 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the Hawaii Beach Preservation Revolving Fund within the State Treasury. Establishes a low-interest Contingent Mortgage Financing Pilot Program to encourage certain shoreline property owners to relocate mauka of expected sea level rise and erosion hazard zones. Amends coastal zone management laws to further protect against impacts of sea level rise and coastal erosion. Appropriates funds. (HB1564 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Coastal Zone Management.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12HouseThe committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
2019-02-08HouseReported from EEP/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 225) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-02-05HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen.
2019-02-05HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WLH on Tuesday, 02-05-19 11:00AM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to EEP/WLH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback