HI HB1561 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Act 028, 04/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1129).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds for the fiscal biennium 2019-2021 operating budget of the Agribusiness Development Corporation (ADC). Requires the Auditor to conduct a performance audit of the ADC. Appropriates funds for the Auditor to contract with an accounting firm to conduct a financial audit of the ADC. Requires the ADC to annually report and post on its website specified information. Appropriates funds for an environmental assessment and appraisal of certain real property. Effective 6/28/2019. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Agribusiness Development.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateAct 028, 04/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1129).
2019-04-29HouseAct 028, on 04/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1129).
2019-04-11HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 802).
2019-04-11HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Saiki excused (2).
2019-04-11SenateReceived notice of House agreement (Hse. Com. No. 718)
2019-04-09HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 686) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2066) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-04-05SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye, Kidani, Taniguchi.
2019-04-02SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-18SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-18SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1232) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-07SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-19 1:15PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to AEN, WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 325).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1036), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-25HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger.
2019-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 706) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-13HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Onishi, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
2019-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-13-19 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback