HI HB1561 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Act 154, 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1256).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Act 154, 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1256).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends nuisance abatement laws to authorize civil suits to abate violations of trespass and other offenses that involve the unlawful occupation of real property. (HB1561 CD1)
Title
Nuisance Abatement; Offenses of Intrusion; Criminal Trespass
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Senate | Act 154, 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1256). |
2016-06-30 | House | Act 154, on 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1256). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 38-16). |
2016-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 38-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K.Kahele, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-16 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-16 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; San Buenaventura, McDermott. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; K.Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 517) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3462) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, K.Kahele, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Slom. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 04-06-16 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 65). |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kong, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). |
2016-03-03 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 730-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-02-09 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Woodson, McDermott. |
2016-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-09-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-14 | House | Prefiled. |