HI HB1559 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the HCDA to permit one building that is up to 768 feet in height and located near a transit station within each approved master plan area for the Kakaako Mauka area of the Kakaako Community Development District, subject to provision of appropriate public benefits. (HB1559 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Kakaako Community Development District.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-02-13HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-13HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19.
2019-02-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:01PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-07HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
2019-02-07HouseReported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 116) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-02-01HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen.
2019-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 02-01-19 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback