HI HB1557 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1557
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes fines on a homeowner, foreclosing party, or prevailing purchaser in foreclosure actions when a vacant residential property subject to foreclosure remains unoccupied during the foreclosure process. Establishes conditions under which a property may be rented. (HB1557 HD1)
Title
Relating To Unoccupied Residential Properties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 323). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Matsumoto, McKelvey, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Gates, Har, Kong, McDermott, Okimoto, Onishi, Tokioka voting no (7) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1079), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Nakamura; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Kong, McKelvey, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 751), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say, Thielen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey. |
2019-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Kong, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 59) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cachola, Har, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1557 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM.