HI HB1557 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Imposes fines on a homeowner, foreclosing party, or prevailing purchaser in foreclosure actions when a vacant residential property subject to foreclosure remains unoccupied during the foreclosure process. Establishes conditions under which a property may be rented. (HB1557 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Unoccupied Residential Properties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateReferred to CPH, JDC/WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 323).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Matsumoto, McKelvey, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Gates, Har, Kong, McDermott, Okimoto, Onishi, Tokioka voting no (7) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1079), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-26HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Nakamura; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
2019-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Kong, McKelvey, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 751), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-02-14HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say, Thielen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey.
2019-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-06HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Kong, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
2019-02-06HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 59) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-02-01HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cachola, Har, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno.
2019-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback