HI HB1557 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-22 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-22 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Office of Hawaiian Affairs Legislative Oversight Committee composed of legislators from both houses to ensure transparency and exercise oversight over the operations of and issues impacting the Office of Hawaiian Affairs.
Title
Office of Hawaiian Affairs; Legislative Oversight Committee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-22 | House | The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-01-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 01-22-14 9:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-15 | House | Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-09 | House | Prefiled |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1557&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1557_.HTM |