HI HB1554 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the Department of Human Services operating budget. Takes effect 7/1/2030. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Department Of Human Services Operating Budget.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1467) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on HMS will hold a public decision making on 03-20-19 2:50PM in conference room 016.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee on HMS has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 03-18-19 2:45PM in conference room 016.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-18-19 2:45PM in conference room 016.
2019-03-07SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 016.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to HMS, WAM.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 501).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1262) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-25HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger.
2019-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Har, Say, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 575) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-13HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say, Tokioka; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 9:00AM in conference room 329.
2019-02-08HouseThe committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19 at 9:00 AM.
2019-02-06HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 02-08-19 10:30AM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback