HI HB1548 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Act 147, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1249).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds to the Department of Land and Natural Resources to study and combat rapid ohia death. (HB1548 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Rapid Ohia Death.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01SenateAct 147, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1249).
2019-07-01HouseAct 147, on 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1249).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 95).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 95) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Gabbard, Inouye, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Yamane, Todd, Tarnas, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 11:45AM in conference room 224.
2019-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 9:30AM in conference room 224.
2019-04-23HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 9:30AM in conference room 224.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; Gabbard, Inouye Co-Chairs; Fevella.
2019-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 811).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Yamane, Todd Co-Chairs; Tarnas, Thielen.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 876) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2032) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-20SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-20SenateReported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1271) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Fevella.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 3:00PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to WTL/AEN, WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 321).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 977), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-22HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2019-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from EEP/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 571) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WLH on Tuesday, 02-12-19 8:55AM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback