HI HB1543 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a process allowing law enforcement officers and family or household members to obtain a court order to prevent a person from accessing firearms and ammunition where the person poses a danger of causing bodily injury to oneself or another.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Gun Violence Protective Orders.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseThe committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 02-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to PVM, JUD, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback