HI HB1540 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - (S) Act 023, 4/27/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1123).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - (S) Act 023, 4/27/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1123).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent statutory provisions that: (1) reduced the maximum employment period for teachers hired on an emergency basis by DOE from 4 years to 3 years; and (2) require those unlicensed teachers hired on an emergency basis prior to 7/1/08, to attain licensure within 4 years from the date of employment.
Title
DOE; Emergency Hires; Teacher Licensure Requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | (S) Act 023, 4/27/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1123). | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Act 023, on 4/27/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1123). | |
2011-04-13 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 422). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) One Day Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1089) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-11 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 965) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-03-11 | (S) Referred to EDU, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 339). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 874), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-28 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-28-11 2:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Reported from EDN/LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 94), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Takumi, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Saiki, Souki. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Takumi, Belatti, Aquino, Hanohano, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Takai, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Awana, Chang, Mizuno, Saiki, Wooley. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN/LAB on Monday, 01-31-11 2:00PM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to EDN/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1553 (Same As) 2011-03-10 - (H) Referred to EDN/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 33
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1540 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HB1540_.HTM |