HI HB1534 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1534
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that workers registered with the department of health's medical cannabis program be reimbursed for the out of pocket cost of medical cannabis through the workers' compensation system in certain circumstances.
Title
Relating To Workers' Compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-07-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1523 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB1534 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB1534 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1534&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1534_.HTM |