HI HB1534 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that workers registered with the department of health's medical cannabis program be reimbursed for the out of pocket cost of medical cannabis through the workers' compensation system in certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Workers' Compensation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07HouseThe committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-02-04HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-07-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB1523 (Same As) 2019-02-06 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback