HI HB1532 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows the Hawaii Labor Relations Board to admit and consider hearsay evidence in unfair labor practices proceedings. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Administrative Procedures.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Johanson, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 871) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1947) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-29-19 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-18SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
2019-03-18SenateReported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1239) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, S. Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to LCA, JDC.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 318).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1009), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-27HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey, Say, Yamane.
2019-02-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-27-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-06HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
2019-02-06HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 107) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-01-31HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-01-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 01-31-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB791 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback