HI HB1530 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1530
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 3:10PM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 3:10PM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes and appropriates funds for the Teacher Mentor Incentive Program within the Department of Education. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 3:10PM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-19 3:15PM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-19 3:15PM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Kanuha Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Hashem, Hashimoto, Ohno, Okimoto. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 870) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2030) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1458) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-20-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 128). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 871), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 721) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:35PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1530 (Carry Over) 2019-04-24 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 3:10PM in conference room 329.