HI HB1525 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an offense for remaining unlawfully in or upon state property after a request to leave is made by any law enforcement officer under certain conditions. Requires the departments with jurisdiction over state property to develop and implement a policy for coordinated enforcement. (HB1525 HD1)
Title
Offenses against Property Rights; Unlawful Occupation of State Property
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3). |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 438-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-02-05 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ing, Pouha; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-05-16 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled. |