HI HB1520 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a retailer from selling or offering for sale combustion engine-powered mopeds beginning 1/1/2024.
Title
Relating To Mopeds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2719 (Same As) 2022-01-24 - Referred to TRS, CPN/JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1520&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1520_.HTM |