HI HB1520 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires energy consumption benchmarking for all nonresidential buildings. Requires disclosure of resulting, anonymized and aggregated benchmarking data to a prospective property buyer, lessee, or lender. (HB 1520 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Energy Efficiency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
2019-02-08HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 223) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-02-07HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen.
2019-02-04HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-07-19 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB1337 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to EET, CPH.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback