HI HB1517 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Act 157, 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1259).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Act 157, 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1259).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the commission of certain offenses of assault, sexual assault, and abuse of a family or household member in the presence of a minor is an aggravating factor to be considered in the sentencing of the defendant convicted of the offense. (HB1517 CD1)
Title
Criminal Sentencing; Certain Offenses Committed in the Presence of a Minor
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Senate | Act 157, 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1259). |
2016-06-30 | House | Act 157, on 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1259). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 13-16). |
2016-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 13-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-21 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kim, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-21 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2016-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-16 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Kim, Shimabukuro. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Hashem, San Buenaventura, McDermott. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 392). |
2016-04-07 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 410) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Slom, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-16. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3305) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K.Kahele. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-16 9:05AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 187). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kong, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). |
2016-03-03 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 712-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-02-04 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-04-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-01-28 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-16 2:00PM in room 325. |
2016-01-28 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-28-16 2:01PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2247 (Same As) 2016-03-10 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 26