HI HB1514 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of health to enforce a prohibition on the feeding of excessive numbers of feral birds without the need to first determine that odors and filth from bird waste are a nuisance. Provides exceptions. Establishes penalties.
Title
Relating To Birds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-01-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | House | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1514&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1514_.HTM |