HI HB1514 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1514
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a taxpayer to indicate on an income tax form a contribution to the Hawaii election campaign fund of up to $20. Amends provisions relating to the ability of publicly-funded candidates to receive and expend campaign funds. (HB1514 HD1)
Title
Relating To Campaign Finance.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 470) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-04 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Thielen. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-04-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-19. |
2019-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-01-19 2:01PM in conference room 325. |
2019-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-01-19. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-31-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1514 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).