HI HB1513 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-29 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-11 at 5:00pm in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-29 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-11 at 5:00pm in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a permanent weed and seed program within DLIR. Appropriates funds. Effective 07/01/2117. (SD2)
Title
Weed and Seed Program; Permanent Establishment; Appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Joey Manahan [D] | Rep. Kymberly Pine [R] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-11 at 5:00pm in Conference Room 325. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-26 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-21 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-11 10:00AM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 648). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Kidani, Co-Chair(s); Shimabukuro, Slom. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: Rhoads, B. Oshiro, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Aquino, Cabanilla, Cullen, Fontaine. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 588) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1171) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 955) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-11 8:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-11 | (S) Referred to JDL, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 333). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 909), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-28-11 5:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 582) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Luke, McKelvey, Morita, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Carroll, Herkes, Ito. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-15-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 170), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Souki, Takumi, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-08-11 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |