HI HB1511 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Community-Based Economic Development Advisory Council to retain and oversee professional research and analysis services for the evaluation of the means for or barriers to private for-profit start-up agricultural businesses to acquire funds for agriculture infrastructure projects. (HB1511 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Community-based Economic Development Advisory Council.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 714) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-02-13HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Onishi, Perruso; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
2019-02-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-13-19 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2019-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on AGR with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
2019-02-08HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 169) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to AGR.
2019-02-06HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Ichiyama, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Johanson, Quinlan.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:00AM in conference room 309.
2019-02-01HouseThe committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-19.
2019-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-01-19 10:10AM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to EDB, AGR, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback