HI HB1511 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with Representative(s) Har, Jordan, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Creagan, San Buenaventura, Say excused (3).
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with Representative(s) Har, Jordan, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Creagan, San Buenaventura, Say excused (3).
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the ERS from investing in coal companies. Requires the ERS to prepare and submit a report to the Legislature regarding divestment from fossil fuel investments. (HB1511 HD1)
Title
Employees' Retirement System; Investments; Coal; Study
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] |
Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with Representative(s) Har, Jordan, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Creagan, San Buenaventura, Say excused (3). |
2016-02-08 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 69-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. |
2016-02-02 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Cullen, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Evans, Ing. |
2016-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-02-16 11:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-26 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-02-16 at 11:30 AM. |
2016-01-22 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 01-26-16 8:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-10-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to EEP, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and passed first reading. |