HI HB1511 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (S) Referred to EDU/EDT, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (S) Referred to EDU/EDT, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the University of Hawaii to extend the current land lease with the high technology development corporation for no less than 25 years from the date of expiration of the existing lease. Effective July 1, 2012. (HB1511 HD2)
Title
High Technology Development Corporation; University of Hawaii; Land Lease
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to EDU/EDT, WAM. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 54). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fontaine, Hanohano, Marumoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Manahan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 836-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-28 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | |
2012-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-27-12 1:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-06 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takai excused (2). | |
2012-02-06 | (H) Reported from ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 95-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-02 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Marumoto, Pine. | |
2012-01-31 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-02-12 8:30AM in conference room 312. | |
2012-01-26 | (H) The committee(s) on ERB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-02-12. | |
2012-01-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Thursday, 01-26-12 8:30AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to ERB, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |