HI HB1510 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 02-01-22 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 02-01-22 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the number of classifications on the salary schedule for teachers of the department of education. Specifies that additional classifications may be included in the teachers' salary schedule pursuant to a collective bargaining agreement negotiated for bargaining unit (5).
Title
Relating To Teachers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 02-01-22 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Re-referred to EDN/LAT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-01-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to EDN, LAT, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | House | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1510&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1510_.HTM |