HI HB1508 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1508
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 121, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1222).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 121, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1222).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a revolving line of credit sub-fund within the Hawaii green infrastructure special fund for a state agency to finance cost-effective energy-efficiency measures. (HB1508 CD1)
Title
Relating To Energy Efficiency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Act 121, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1222). |
2018-07-10 | Senate | Act 121, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1222). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Say voting no (1) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 164-18). |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 164-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2018-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Cullen, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 225. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 2:00PM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-26 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-27-18 9:30AM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 827). |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Wakai, English Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Cullen Co-Chairs; Todd, McDermott. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 590) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3615) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3197) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-18 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to TRE/GVO, WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 360). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1025) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Tupola. |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2). |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 364) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Kong, Say, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-09-17 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1508 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to TRE/GVO, WAM.