HI HB1507 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a three-year livestock wastewater treatment pilot program within HDOA for the application of the Ydro Process to livestock wastewater treatment facilities. Requires HDOA to report to the legislature before the regular session of 2022. Appropriates funds. (HB1507 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Agriculture.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5).
2019-02-13HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 367), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-12-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-06HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EEP with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
2019-02-06HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 86) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EEP.
2019-02-01HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Perruso, Okimoto; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Onishi; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
2019-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-01-19 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to AGR, EEP, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback