HI HB1504 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to LAT, PDP, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to LAT, PDP, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employers to provide a minimum amount of paid sick leave to employees to be used to care for themselves or a family member who is ill or needs medical care and supplemental paid sick leave to employees under certain public health emergency conditions.
Title
Relating To Paid Sick Leave.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to LAT, PDP, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2492 (Same As) 2022-01-24 - Referred to LCA, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1504&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1504_.HTM |