HI HB1503 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Act 060, 4/30/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1160).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Act 060, 4/30/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1160).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Voids any rental agreement provision that allows for eviction of a tenant who has a valid certificate for the medical use of marijuana unless: (1) the rental agreement allows for eviction for smoking tobacco and the medical marijuana is smoked; or (2) the documents of a condominium property regime or planned community association prohibit the medical use of marijuana. Effective 11/01/2014. (SD1)
Title
Residential Landlord-Tenant Code; Medical Marijuana; Eviction; Rental Agreement; Voided Provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Senate | Act 060, 4/30/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1160). |
2014-05-01 | House | Act 060, on 4/30/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1160). |
2014-04-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 688). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2014-04-14 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with Representative(s) Har, Tokioka, Tsuji voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Fukumoto, Ito, Matsumoto voting no (4) and Representative(s) Ing, Oshiro excused (2). |
2014-04-14 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 682). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Hee Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-11 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-10-14. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 518) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3327) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Solomon, Slom. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 03-28-14 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2852) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-14 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 214). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Fale, Fukumoto, Har, Ito, Johanson, Matsumoto, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tsuji voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Wooley excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Woodson excused (2). |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 669-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-19 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Brower, Creagan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Tsuji; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ito; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, McDermott. |
2014-02-19 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Brower, Creagan, Evans, C. Lee, Nakashima, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Har, Oshiro, Tsuji, Yamane; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ito; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, McDermott. |
2014-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Wednesday, 02-19-14 2:15PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-15 | House | Referred to CPC/JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled |