HI HB1501 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Act 072, 07/03/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1173).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Act 072, 07/03/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1173).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reclassifies drug paraphernalia possession and delivery offenses from felonies to violations subject to a fine of no more than $500. (HB1501 CD1)
Title
Relating To Drug Paraphernalia.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-06 | Senate | Act 072, 07/03/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1173). |
2017-07-06 | House | Act 072, on 07/03/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1173). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Say, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Har, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Ohno, Oshiro, Tupola, Ward voting no (9) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 11). |
2017-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 11) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2017-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, San Buenaventura, Creagan; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2017-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-24-17 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; English, K. Rhoads. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takayama, San Buenaventura Co-Chairs; Creagan, Thielen. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 664) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1498) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-17 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDL. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 359). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto, Oshiro, Tupola, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1033) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Oshiro; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Nakashima, McDermott. |
2017-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-01-17 12:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 256) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, LoPresti, Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-09-17 10:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1248 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM.