HI HB1499 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of agriculture to partner with a Hawaii entity to establish a pilot USDA Harmonized GAP food safety training and certification program to help small- and medium-sized farms obtain the United States Department of Agriculture's Harmonized Good Agricultural Practices certification. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Food Safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3273) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 14). |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 745-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2022-02-16 | House | Reported from AGR/ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 440-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-11 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi. |
2022-02-11 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2022-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/ECD on Friday, 02-11-22 9:45AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to AGR/ECD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2975 (Same As) 2022-01-24 - Referred to AEN, WAM.