HI HB1497 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1497
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Stadium Development District comprising all state land under the Stadium Authority's jurisdiction. Authorizes HCDA to facilitate the development of all state property within the District including building a new stadium. Authorizes the issuance of revenue bonds and general obligation bonds. Appropriates funds. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Community Development Authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1386) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 2:55PM in conference room 414. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 497). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1243) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Todd, McDermott. |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 612) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2019-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 02-13-19 10:45AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 210) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WLH. |
2019-02-07 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-07-19 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-02-01 | House | Re-referred to LAB, WLH, FIN, referral sheet 11 |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB/WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1497 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB1530 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1388).
SB1530 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1388).