HI HB1497 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employers, regardless of whether the employers contract with a professional employer organization, to keep a record of the physical addresses of the employer and the North American Industry Classification System code applicable to the employer. Requires professional employer organizations to provide the physical address, North American Industry Classification System code, and number of covered employees of each client company to the DLIR. Requires client companies of a professional employer organization to report and update their physical address and North American Industry Classification System code. Takes effect on 1/7/2059. (SD2)
Title
Labor; Professional Employer Organizations; Employers; Records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2016-04-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2016-04-13 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-04-29 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 10:00AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 10:00AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Shimabukuro. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, McKelvey, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Johanson, McDermott. |
2015-04-20 | House | Re-referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 436). |
2015-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 490) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Galuteria). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-15. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1335) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kahele, Kidani, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 04-01-15 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1143) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-24-15 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to JDL, CPN. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 135). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 731), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-26-15 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-18 | House | Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 20 |
2015-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 114) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2015-02-06 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Nakashima, Keohokalole, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Aquino. |
2015-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-06-15 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |