HI HB1490 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1490
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to provide enhanced payments to type I adult residential care homes and developmental disabilities domiciliary homes that are caring for medicaid patients.
Title
Relating To Medicaid Patient Care.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-02 | House | Re-referred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1490 (Carry Over) 2023-02-02 - Re-referred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 7
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
COVID Costs
Developmental Disabilities Domiciliary Homes
Enhanced Payments
Medicaid
Type I Adult Residential Care Homes
COVID Costs
Developmental Disabilities Domiciliary Homes
Enhanced Payments
Medicaid
Type I Adult Residential Care Homes
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1490&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1490_.HTM |