HI HB1488 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to GVO/LCA/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires DAGS, in consultation with the Legislature and appropriate agencies, to develop and implement an enhanced security plan for the State Capitol. Appropriates funds to DAGS for enhanced security measures and security improvements, including vehicular barriers and to PSD to purchase or lease security screening equipment and contract private screening personnel for the State Capitol. (HB1488 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The State Capitol.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateReferred to GVO/LCA/PSM, WAM.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 126).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 910), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2019-02-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from LMG/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 534) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Cullen, Nakashima, Belatti, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LMG/JUD on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to LMG/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback