HI HB1488 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Act 041, 06/20/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1141).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Adds additional qualifying medical conditions for medical marijuana patients and permits possession of additional plants. Amends requirements for and access to testing. Extends deadlines related to implementation of the dispensary system. Amends security, information tracking, and access requirements for licensed facilities. Clarifies DOH regulatory authority. Authorizes additional retail dispensing locations and plants for existing licensees. Requires DOH to report to Legislative Oversight Working Group. (HB1488 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Medical Marijuana.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22SenateAct 041, 06/20/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1141).
2017-06-22HouseAct 041, on 06/20/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1141).
2017-05-03HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2017-05-04SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
2017-05-03HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
2017-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) DeCoite voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Har, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting no (7) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
2017-05-02SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
2017-04-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
2017-04-28SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 193).
2017-04-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
2017-04-28HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 193) as amended in (CD 1).
2017-04-28SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Keith-Agaran, English, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-28HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, San Buenaventura, Cullen, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-28SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 4:30PM in conference room 016.
2017-04-27SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2017-04-26SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2017-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 1:00PM in conference room 016.
2017-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 1:00PM in conference room 016.
2017-04-21SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 1:00PM in conference room 016.
2017-04-19HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 1:45PM in conference room 016.
2017-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Keith-Agaran, English Co-Chairs; Espero, Ruderman.
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585).
2017-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Belatti, San Buenaventura, Cullen Co-Chairs; Thielen.
2017-04-13HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2017-04-11HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 662) in amended form (SD 1).
2017-04-11SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2017-04-07SenateOne Day Notice 04-11-17.
2017-04-07SenateReported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1490) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2017-03-30SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro.
2017-03-30SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-03-24SenateThe committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 9:50AM in conference room 211.
2017-03-24SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
2017-03-24SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1114) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM.
2017-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Ihara, Kidani.
2017-03-16SenateThe committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 03-21-17 10:00AM in conference room 229.
2017-03-10SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-17 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to CPH, JDL/WAM.
2017-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 201).
2017-03-03HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Tupola, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-03-03HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 958), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2017-02-23HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Quinlan, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Tupola; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
2017-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-17 12:00PM in House conference room 308.
2017-02-17HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
2017-02-17HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 610), recommending referral to FIN.
2017-02-14HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Oshiro; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2017-02-10HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-14-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2017-02-09HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Tupola voting no (3) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
2017-02-09HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 161) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2017-02-07HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Har; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Oshiro, Tupola; and Excused: none.
2017-02-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-07-17 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2017-01-30HouseReferred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
2017-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB1159 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback