HI HB1485 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of transportation to amend the adopt-a-highway program to reduce the minimum number of years a program participant must agree to clean up litter on a highway from two years to one year. Appropriates funds for the department of transportation to establish an anti-litter campaign.
Title
Relating To Litter Control.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-09-22 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | House | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1485&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1485_.HTM |