HI HB1482 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1482
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the operations of the K-12 Agriculture Workforce Development Pipeline Initiative.
Title
Relating To Workforce Development.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1). |
2017-02-07 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 53), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. |
2017-02-03 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-02 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-03-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to AGR, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1482 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1482&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1482_.HTM |