HI HB1481 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a working group to study the uses of and determine best practices regarding blockchain technology. Effective 7/1/2038. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Economic Development.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2017-03-24SenateReported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1054) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2017-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
2017-03-10SenateThe committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-17 1:15PM in conference room 414.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to ETT, WAM.
2017-03-03SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-03-03SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 71).
2017-03-02HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-03-02HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 771), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2017-02-22HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Choy.
2017-02-18HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-22-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2017-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2017-02-14HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 303) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2017-02-03HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Johanson, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
2017-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-03-17 9:15AM in House conference room 309.
2017-01-30HouseReferred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 6
2017-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback