HI HB1481 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides increase penalties for the failure to register a motor vehicle or failure to keep a certificate of registration in a motor vehicle. Maintains additional fines within the county in which the violation occurred.
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration; Penalties
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-07-11 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1481 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1481_.HTM |