HI HB1480 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes additional uses of moneys in the reduced ignition propensity cigarette program special fund to support the State Fire Council and its programs and activities.
Title
Relating To The Reduced Ignition Propensity Cigarette Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2013 (Same As) 2022-01-20 - Referred to PSM, WAM.
Subjects
Fire Protection
Operating Expenses
Reduced Ignition Propensity Cigarette Program
State Fire Council Package
Operating Expenses
Reduced Ignition Propensity Cigarette Program
State Fire Council Package
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1480&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1480_.HTM |