HI HB1479 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1479
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the period in which a county may adopt a surcharge on state tax, under certain conditions. Authorizes the use of the surcharge revenues for affordable and workforce housing infrastructure. Allows the counties to use surcharge revenues for housing infrastructure, including roadways, water, and sewer.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to LGO, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1099 (Same As) 2024-05-29 - Act 030, 05/28/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1130).
HB1479 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to LGO, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB1479 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to LGO, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1479&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1479_.HTM |