HI HB147 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB147
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the vehicle weight tax exemption for noncommercial vehicles by removing the exemption for military reserves and other active duty military personnel and adding an exemption for certain veterans.
Title
Relating To Vehicle Weight Taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1046 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB147 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB147 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=147&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB147_.HTM |