HI HB1467 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Changes the assessment of the state fuel tax from a specified amount per gallon to the greater of a specified amount per gallon or an unspecified percentage of the wholesale price per gallon to the retailer. Subjects biodiesel oil to the same tax rates and reporting requirements as diesel oil. (HB1467 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Motor Vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateReferred to WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 309).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1078), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-26HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
2019-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
2019-02-14HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 392) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-06HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback