HI HB1467 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires retail service stations to provide tire pressure gauges and operational tire inflation devices to enable motorists to maintain properly inflated tires, thereby increasing the fuel efficiency of existing vehicles. Provides a penalty for violations. (HB1467 HD1)
Title
Vehicle Efficiency; Tire Pressure Gauges; Tire Inflation Devices
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Hermina Morita [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with Representative(s) Chang voting no (1) and Representative(s) Bertram, Takai, Takumi excused (3). | |
2009-02-17 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 300) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. | |
2009-02-10 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Morita, Coffman, Cabanilla, C. Lee, Luke, Sagum, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Ching; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Chang, Ito; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Chong, Herkes. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-10-09 9:00 AM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to EEP, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-27 | (H) Pending introduction. |